U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00105
  • Case Name: Henson v. Nunn
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Receipt]
  • February 25, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 04, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • February 04, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.