U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00109
  • Case Name: Spaulding v. Nunn et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • March 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 15, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • March 15, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 04, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • February 04, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 04, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.