U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00107
  • Case Name: Hayes v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 11, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 04, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • February 04, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 04, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.