U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00058
  • Case Name: Guajardo-Schlemmer v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • January 23, 2023: [Attorney Fees]
  • January 17, 2023: [Attorney Fees]
  • January 17, 2023: [Brief]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • October 18, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • October 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 16, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 13, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • May 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 07, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 07, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
  • February 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.