U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00112
  • Case Name: Giang v. DeJoy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Sanctions]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 29, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • November 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 01, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • August 01, 2022: [Default Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 06, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Receipt]
  • February 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.