U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00108
  • Case Name: Stross v. Mulinix Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Docket]
  • April 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • March 29, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • March 08, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 08, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.