U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00114
  • Case Name: A Bettor Company LLC v. Better Vodka Corp
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 04, 2022: [Strike]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • February 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 16, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 08, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • February 08, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • February 08, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • February 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.