U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00101
  • Case Name: Guerra v. United States Citizenship and Immmigration Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • July 06, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • February 09, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.