U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00113
  • Case Name: Harcourt v. Dennis et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 25, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 24, 2022: [Receipt]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 09, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • February 09, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.