U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company v. Hattler et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 12, 2022: [Witness List]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • August 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • July 20, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Witness List]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • April 05, 2022: [Docket]
  • April 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • February 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 11, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.