U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00044
  • Case Name: Cole et al v. AMC West Housing LP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • November 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • April 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 04, 2022: [Docket]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 17, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 24, 2022: [Reply]
  • February 17, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • February 10, 2022: [Clarify]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.