U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00118
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Tulsa Adjustment Bureau Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 11, 2023: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 11, 2023: [Leave]
  • January 11, 2023: [Docket]
  • January 10, 2023: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • June 01, 2022: [Leave]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • May 06, 2022: [Docket]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 11, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 10, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.