U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00119
  • Case Name: Patterson et al v. Orrklahoma West LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 25, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order]
  • July 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 06, 2022: [Docket]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Docket]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 05, 2022: [Docket]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 25, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • March 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • February 18, 2022: [Compel]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Pending Motions]
  • February 11, 2022: [Certificate]
  • February 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 11, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.