U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Fields v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • December 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2022: [Brief]
  • December 07, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • December 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • September 06, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • September 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 18, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 18, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • May 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 11, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 11, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.