U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00120
  • Case Name: Fouts v. Air Wisconsin Airlines LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • March 31, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 31, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 16, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.