U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00127
  • Case Name: Moss et al v. Board of County Commissioners of Canadian County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Address Change]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2024
  • October 15, 2024: [File Excess Pages]
  • October 11, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 10, 2024: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • October 08, 2024: [File Excess Pages]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Related or Companion Case]
  • January 06, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 03, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 03, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 24, 2022: [Reply]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • June 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 14, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • June 10, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • June 08, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 10, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Reply]
  • April 12, 2022: [Leave to File Reply]
  • April 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 21, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • March 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 04, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 02, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 15, 2022: [Receipt]
  • February 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.