U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00147
  • Case Name: Driggers v. Oklahoma State of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Receipt]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 18, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • February 18, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.