U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00149
  • Case Name: Ailumerab et al v. Mayorkas et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 05, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 05, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 06, 2022: [Status Report]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 18, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.