U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00150
  • Case Name: Farley v. James Crabtree Correctional Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Mail Returned]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 18, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 18, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • February 18, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.