U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00153
  • Case Name: Liebeck v. American Phoenix Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Quash]
  • January 19, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • January 10, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Compel]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Protective Order]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 26, 2022: [Leave]
  • April 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [Docket]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 22, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.