U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00148
  • Case Name: Morris v. Oklahoma State of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [USCA Order - without Notice of Appeal]
  • January 06, 2023: [Writ of Mandamus]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [State Court Records Received - Conventional Filing]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • August 16, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order for Response]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 27, 2022: [Receipt]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • February 18, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • February 18, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 18, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.