U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00152
  • Case Name: Cavazos v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • June 10, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Transfer Case]
  • May 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • March 17, 2022: [Receipt]
  • March 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 07, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • March 03, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 18, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • February 18, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.