U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00154
  • Case Name: Williams v. SKF USA Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Receipt]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 14, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • February 22, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.