U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00156
  • Case Name: Chambers v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • December 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 07, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • September 06, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • May 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • May 20, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 25, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 22, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 22, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.