U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00160
  • Case Name: Bentley v. Harvonek
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • September 01, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 26, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [State Court Records Received - Conventional Filing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 14, 2022: [Receipt]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 23, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 22, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • February 22, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 22, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • February 22, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.