U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00161
  • Case Name: Bowens v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Objections]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Case Reopened]
  • May 19, 2022: [Receipt]
  • May 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • April 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 08, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 11, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 23, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • February 23, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • February 23, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Mandamus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.