U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00163
  • Case Name: Krieger v. Oklahoma Publishing Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 02, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for More Definite Statement]
  • April 04, 2022: [Docket]
  • April 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2022: [More Definite Statement]
  • March 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 08, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [Report Regarding Patent and Trademark]
  • February 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.