U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00162
  • Case Name: Davis v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • March 21, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 02, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 01, 2022: [Receipt]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 25, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 24, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • February 24, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 24, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.