U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00166
  • Case Name: Shelby et al v. Clemons et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • June 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 25, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 25, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.