U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00165
  • Case Name: Bradberry v. Trulite Glass and Aluminum Solutions LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Intervene]
  • December 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 30, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • August 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Docket]
  • March 02, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • March 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • February 28, 2022: [Certificate]
  • February 25, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.