U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00167
  • Case Name: Henderson et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 18, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Witness List]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 20, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • June 07, 2022: [Docket]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • March 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.