U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00170
  • Case Name: Brown v. Halliburton Energy Services Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Bill of Costs Hearing set]
  • January 05, 2023: [Brief]
  • January 05, 2023: [Bill of Costs]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • November 15, 2022: [Witness List]
  • November 15, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • November 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 14, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 16, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • June 13, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • June 13, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 06, 2022: [Answer to Intervenor Complaint]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Intervenor Complaint]
  • April 15, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Intervene]
  • April 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Docket]
  • March 01, 2022: [Receipt]
  • March 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.