U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00171
  • Case Name: Clark v. Doe
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • August 17, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • June 03, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Declining Report and Recommendation]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 19, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • May 11, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 06, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 01, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • March 01, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.