U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00173
  • Case Name: Hoover v. Elite Line Services Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 07, 2022: [Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 20, 2022: [Objections]
  • October 05, 2022: [Objections]
  • October 05, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • October 04, 2022: [Declaration]
  • October 03, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 20, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 19, 2022: [Leave]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [ADR Report by Parties]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 05, 2022: [Docket]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 01, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.