U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00175
  • Case Name: Six v. American Fidelity Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 20, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 04, 2023: [Objections]
  • January 03, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Objections]
  • December 28, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 21, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 15, 2022: [Witness List]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Witness List]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 14, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 12, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • April 12, 2022: [Substitute Party]
  • April 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 10, 2022: [Docket]
  • March 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • March 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 01, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.