U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00180
  • Case Name: Clark et al v. Delarosa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 04, 2022: [Remand]
  • March 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 03, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.