U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00178
  • Case Name: Klickman et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • March 24, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 02, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 02, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.