U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00182
  • Case Name: Big D Industries Inc v. Fresh Products Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • July 07, 2022: [Docket]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 31, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • May 10, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • March 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Related or Companion Case]
  • March 03, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • March 03, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 03, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 03, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.