U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00185
  • Case Name: Miller et al v. First United Bank and Trust Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 25, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 11, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Add Party]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • June 09, 2022: [Add Party]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 04, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 11, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • April 04, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Receipt]
  • March 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 04, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • March 04, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.