U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00187
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Hanza et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Show Cause]
  • January 17, 2023: [Joint Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Docket]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • June 13, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Entry of Default]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • April 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 04, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.