U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00184
  • Case Name: Arreaga et al v. Sobczak et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 21, 2022: [Certificate]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Settlement]
  • September 15, 2022: [Friendly Suit Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • August 23, 2022: [Settlement]
  • August 22, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 17, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Case Reopened]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Reopening Case]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 15, 2022: [Add Party]
  • August 09, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • April 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • March 31, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • March 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 23, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 21, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 16, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 14, 2022: [Docket]
  • March 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 04, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.