U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00190
  • Case Name: Great Plains National Bank v. Starnet Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • March 24, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 21, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • March 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Expedite]
  • March 09, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • March 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 08, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.