U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00189
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 26, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 16, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • May 12, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • May 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 09, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 09, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 07, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.