U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00191
  • Case Name: Coleson v. Feed The Children Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • August 03, 2022: [Docket]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • May 20, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 08, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.