U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00195
  • Case Name: Dotson v. Delivery Financial Services LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 09, 2022: [Receipt]
  • March 09, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • March 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.