U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00192
  • Case Name: Baker v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • July 13, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 23, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 02, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 09, 2022: [Receipt]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • March 09, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • March 09, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 09, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.