U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00194
  • Case Name: King et al v. Oklahoma Department of Human Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 04, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 25, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 16, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • June 15, 2022: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document/Directing Filing of Redacted Document]
  • June 13, 2022: [Seal Document/Directing Filing of Redacted Document]
  • June 13, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 10, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 09, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 25, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 05, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • March 09, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.