U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00196
  • Case Name: Dotson v. GLA Collection Company Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • May 23, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • May 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Compel]
  • April 26, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • April 26, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 25, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 21, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • April 20, 2022: [Brief]
  • April 18, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 04, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 03, 2022: [Leave]
  • April 03, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • April 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 09, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • March 09, 2022: [Receipt]
  • March 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.