U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00198
  • Case Name: Dotson v. Source Receivables Management LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 27, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 25, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 20, 2022: [Intervene]
  • April 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 05, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • April 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 03, 2022: [Leave]
  • April 03, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • April 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 10, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • March 10, 2022: [Receipt]
  • March 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.