U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00199
  • Case Name: Bruner v. Oklahoma City City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • August 10, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • August 01, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Docket]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 28, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 20, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 17, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • March 13, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.